|
02.08.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
02.08.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
09.05.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.05.2024 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
10.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
20.03.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.02.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2019 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Invitation to appoint representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.03.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.01.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |