07.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.05.2024 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.01.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.01.2024 |
Change - inventor |
published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
28.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.10.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
31.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
31.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
25.10.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
27.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
29.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|