EP3528081 - PROTECTIVE AIRCRAFT LANDING METHOD AND DEVICE AND AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autel Robotics Co., Ltd. 9th Floor Bldg.B1 Zhiyuan 1001 Xueyuan Rd. Xili, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Ying Autel Robotics Co., Ltd. 9th Floor Bldg. B1 Zhiyuan 1001 Xueyuan Rd., Xili, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Yu Autel Robotics Co., Ltd. 9th Floor Bldg. B1 Zhiyuan 1001 Xueyuan Rd., Xili, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17842281.2 | 26.12.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017CN118662 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019127023 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528081 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/12, B64C27/08, G06K9/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
B64D45/04 (EP);
B64U70/00 (EP,US);
G05D1/0055 (US);
G05D1/0202 (US);
G05D1/0676 (EP);
G06V10/44 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (EP,US);
G06V20/17 (EP,US);
G08G5/0069 (EP,US);
G08G5/0086 (EP,US);
G08G5/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGLANDUNGSSCHUTZVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG SOWIE FLUGZEUG | [2019/34] | English: | PROTECTIVE AIRCRAFT LANDING METHOD AND DEVICE AND AIRCRAFT | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'ATTERRISSAGE D'AÉRONEF ET AÉRONEF | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2018 | Translation filed | 26.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2018 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 28.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN105787192 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD); |