EP3504532 - DIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Royal Melbourne Institute Of Technology 124 La Trobe Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | For all designated states The University of Melbourne The University of Melbourne Victoria 3010 / AU | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWNIE, Laura, Elizabeth 9 Locksley Road Ivanhoe, Victoria 3079 / AU | 02 /
YEO, Leslie 9 Moama Road Malvern East, Victoria 3145 / AU | 03 /
MCDONNELL, Amarin, George 19 Montanus Court Ringwood North, Victoria 3134 / AU | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17842455.2 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017AU50900 | Priority number, date | AU20160903362 | 24.08.2016 Original published format: AU 2016903362 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018035569 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504532 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/00, G01N29/02 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G01N11/00 (EP);
G01N11/02 (US);
A61B5/0051 (US);
A61B8/00 (US);
G01N13/02 (US);
G01N29/00 (US);
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
G01N29/036 (EP);
G01N29/14 (US);
G01N29/2418 (US);
G01N29/4436 (EP);
G01N33/487 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G01N11/02, G01N29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2019/27] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC METHODS AND DEVICE | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - GOUVEIA S M ET AL, "Human tear viscosity: An interactive role for proteins and lipids", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, NETHERLANDS, vol. 1753, no. 2, ISSN 1570-9639, (20051201), pages 155 - 163, (20051201), XP027627787 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract * | [Y] - MCDONNELL AMARIN G ET AL, "ADMiER-ing thin but complex fluids", SMART NANO-MICRO MATERIALS AND DEVICES, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20111221), vol. 8204, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.903238, pages 1 - 7, XP060000517 [Y] 1-15 * sections "INTRODUCTION" and "ADMiER" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.903238 | [Y] - BHATTACHARJEE P K ET AL, "Extensional flow of low-viscosity fluids in capillary bridges formed by pulsed surface acoustic wave jetting;Extensional flow of low-viscosity fluids in capillary bridges formed by pulsed surface acoustic wave jetting", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20110201), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/13/2/023005, ISSN 1367-2630, page 23005, XP020204377 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/13/2/023005 | International search | [A]WO2011160168 (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al)[A] 0; | [Y] - TIFFANY, J. M. et al., "The viscosity of human tears", International Ophthamology, (19910000), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1007/BF00137947, ISSN 0165-5701, pages 371 - 376, XP009513736 [Y] 1-57 * . Abstract, Figure 1, Table 1, Page 3 Column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00137947 | [Y] - MCDONNELL, A. G., "The acoustically-driven microfluidic extensional rheometer: development, validation, and application to complex low-viscosity fluids", PhD Thesis, Monash University, (20160223), pages 1 - 191, URL: https://www.google.nl/url?sa=t&rct=j&q=&esrc=s&source=web&cd=2&ved=0ahUKEwiFr7q3qsPaAhUJkywKHSJxCnIQFggtMAE&url=https%3A%2F%2Fau-east.erc.monash.edu.au%2Ffpfiles%2F7707409%2Fmonash_173232.pdf&usg=AOvVaw17C_3jTxbwo72yTq0M3HQ6, XP055468102 [Y] 1-57 * . Chapters 2, 3.2, 4.2-4.4, 6.3-6.4 * | by applicant | WO2011160168 | - GOUVEIA et al., "Human tear viscosity: An interactive role for proteins and lipids", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, (20050000), vol. 1753, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.bbapap.2005.08.023, pages 155 - 163, XP005173950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbapap.2005.08.023 | - MCDONNELL et al., "ADMiER-ing thin but complex", SMART NANO-MICRO MATERIALS AND DEVICES, (20110000), vol. 8204, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.903238, pages 1 - 7, XP060000517 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.903238 | - BHATTACHARJEE et al., "Extensional flow of low-viscosity fluids in capillary bridges formed by pulsed surface acoustic wave jetting; Extensional flow of low-viscosity fluids in capillary bridges formed by pulsed surface acoustic wave jetting", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (20110000), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/13/2/023005, page 23005, XP020204377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/13/2/023005 | - TIFFANY et al., "The viscosity of human tears", INTERNATIONAL OPHTHAMOLOGY, (19910000), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1007/BF00137947, pages 371 - 376, XP009513736 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00137947 | - "The acoustically-driven microfluidic extensional rheometer: development, validation, and application to complex low-viscosity fluids", MCDONNELL et al., PhD Thesis, Monash Universit, (20160000), pages 1 - 191 |