EP3506254 - SOUNDPROOF STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTSU Akihiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
HAKUTA Shinya c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZOE Shogo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17843523.6 | 21.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017JP29749 | Priority number, date | JP20160165569 | 26.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016165569 | [2019/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018038043 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506254 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3506254 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00, G10K11/172, G10K11/175 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G10K11/175 (EP,US);
E04B1/84 (US);
E01F8/00 (EP,US);
G10K11/162 (US);
G10K11/172 (EP,US);
E04B2001/8263 (US);
E04B2001/8452 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/27] | G10K11/16, E01F8/00, G10K11/172 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLDICHTE STRUKTUR | [2019/27] | English: | SOUNDPROOF STRUCTURE | [2019/27] | French: | STRUCTURE D'INSONORISATION | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2019 | Translation filed | 18.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS62266012 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [I] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19509678 (MOESER MICHAEL PROF DR ING [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 ** column 3, line 48 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0798426 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 6, line 18 - line 38 * * page 8, line 6 - line 14 *; | [X]JP2002220817 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [I]JP2005163334 (NGK INSULATORS LTD, et al) [I] 1 * it is sufficient to attach the thin-film material which permeate|transmits a sound wave to this opening end for approach prevention of rain water or dust.; paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]US2005263343 (YANO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-10,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * [A] 2-4 [I] 11; | [X]JP2009139556 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]KR100930101B (YOUNG MA ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]KR20130027916 (UNISON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [YA]JPH08199701 (RICOH KK) [Y] 10-11 * , paragraphs [0046] to [0076]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 1-9, 12-13; | [YA]JP2001327348 (DAIWA HOUSE IND) [Y] 1, 5-7, 10-11, 13 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 2-4, 8-9, 12; | [A]JP2011099319 (KURIMOTO LTD) [A] 1-13* , paragraphs [0015] to [0041]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2011170003 (INOUE MTP KK) [Y] 1, 5-7, 10-11, 13 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0022]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-4, 8-9, 12 | Examination | KR100930101B | EP3438967 | by applicant | JP5380610B |