EP3504268 - AMORPHOUS PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthomer Adhesive Technologies LLC 25435 Harvard Road Beachwood, Ohio 44122 / US | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUVUNDAMINA, Mutombo, Joseph 5 Castleton Court Johnson City TN 37615 / US | 02 /
ROBE, Gary, Robert 761 Foothills Road Kingsport TN 37663 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Timothy 5717 Mohican Lane Kingsport TN 37664 / US | 04 /
HAGOOD, Andrea Gail 3808 Branding Place Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | 05 /
SOOD, Dhiraj, Sudesh 130 Sun Chase Court Johnson City TN 37615 / US | 06 /
SOMERS, Marc, Stacey 345 Hillcrest Road Kilgore TX 75662 / US | 07 /
NOVAK, Bennett, H. 297 Wiley Page Road Longview TX 75605 / US | 08 /
RAJESH RAJA, Puthenkovilakom 619 Rollingbrook Street Apt. 2201 Baytown TX 77521 / US | 09 /
COTTLE, Raymond, Prescott 1112 Stillmeadow Lane Longview TX 75604 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17844383.4 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US48322 | Priority number, date | US201662378698P | 24.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662378698 P | US201715683964 | 23.08.2017 Original published format: US201715683964 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018039406 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504268 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L23/00, C08L23/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/14, C08F210/06, C09J123/14, C08K5/01, C08K5/134, C08L53/02 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08K5/134 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C09J11/06 (EP,US);
C09J123/10 (EP,US);
C09J123/14 (EP,US);
C08F2500/02 (US);
C08F2500/17 (US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F4/6465 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6543 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/17 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/27] | C08L23/16, C08L23/00, C08L23/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | AMORPHE PROPYLEN-ETHYLEN-COPOLYMERE | [2019/27] | English: | AMORPHOUS PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS | [2019/27] | French: | COPOLYMÈRES AMORPHES DE PROPYLÈNE-ÉTHYLÈNE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015225619 (SOMERS MARC STACEY [US], et al) [X] 1-20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008194765 (BECKER HINNERK GORDON [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2011054117 (HALL GREGORY K [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015225619 (SOMERS MARC STACEY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |