EP3508367 - BATTERY BOX LOCKING DEVICE AND BATTERY BOX COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nio Co., Ltd. 20 Building No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAO, Zander 20 Building No. 56 Antuo Road Anting Town Jiading Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17845062.3 | 14.07.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017CN92882 | Priority number, date | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610791996 | [2019/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018040759 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508367 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04, H01M2/10, F16B5/02 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
B60L50/64 (EP,CN,US);
B60K1/04 (CN);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/262 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEBEHÄLTERVERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BATTERIEBEHÄLTER DAMIT | [2019/28] | English: | BATTERY BOX LOCKING DEVICE AND BATTERY BOX COMPRISING SAME | [2019/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE ET BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 25.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010184621 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]US2012195711 (CHIU MING-CHUNG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 21-31, and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN102666222 (RENAULT SAS) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN103687738 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [PX]CN106080159 (NEXTEV LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 30-53, and figures 1-5 *; | [PX]CN205823862U (PEIKE (SHANGHAI) IND TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 50-55, and figures 1-6 *; | [PX]CN106274434 (SHANGHAI NEXTEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 26-34, and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN106347093 (SHANGHAI NEXTEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 26-34 and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN205970808U (SHANGHAI NEXTEV AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 26-34, and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN206171159U (SHANGHAI NEXTEV CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 26-34, and figures 1-4 * |