Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
07.06.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
07.06.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
13.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.03.2019 | Change - representative | |
30.03.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.03.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.03.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |