Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6821794B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B2 | JP2019534813 | 05.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN92882 | 14.07.2017 | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3508367 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN92882 | 14.07.2017 | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018040759 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018062129 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106347093B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2019 | B | CN106347093 | 25.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201610791996 | 31.08.2016 |