24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
19.04.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
12.05.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
10.05.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.01.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
13.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
13.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
13.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
01.11.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
31.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.02.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
05.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|