Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11215698 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | B2 | US2021132199 | 06.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 | WO2017JP20055 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102342233B | Global Dossier | 23.12.2021 | B1 | KR20190039994 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 | WO2017JP20055 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6871259B | Global Dossier | 12.05.2021 | B2 | JPWO2018042785 | 24.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 | WO2017JP20055 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109690777B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B | CN109690777 | 26.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 | WO2017JP20055 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3506355 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | EP3506355 | 15.04.2020 | A4 | EP3506355 | 03.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 | WO2017JP20055 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018042785 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016166683 | 29.08.2016 |