EP3508811 - VEHICULAR ORIENTATION DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aichi Steel Corporation 1, Wano-wari Arao-machi Tokai-shi, Aichi 476-8666 / JP | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO Michiharu c/o AICHI STEEL CORPORATION 1 Wanowari Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8666 / JP | 02 /
NAGAO Tomohiko c/o AICHI STEEL CORPORATION 1 Wanowari Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8666 / JP | 03 /
AOYAMA Hitoshi c/o AICHI STEEL CORPORATION 1 Wanowari Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8666 / JP | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17846277.6 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017JP30274 | Priority number, date | JP20160168474 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016168474 | [2019/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018043272 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508811 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3508811 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/00, G05D1/02, B60W30/12, B62D15/02, B62D6/00, G08G1/042, G08G1/16 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G08G1/042 (EP);
B60W40/10 (US);
B62D15/025 (EP);
B62D6/003 (EP);
E01F11/00 (US);
G05D1/0261 (EP);
B60W2420/50 (US);
B60W2520/06 (US);
B60W2540/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | G01B7/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FAHRZEUGAUSRICHTUNG | [2019/28] | English: | VEHICULAR ORIENTATION DETECTION SYSTEM | [2019/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'ORIENTATION DE VÉHICULE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2019 | Translation filed | 20.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09183383 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JPH10160486 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [XI]DE19803043 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [XI]US2016082957 (ZSOMBORY SANDOR [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US5347456 (ZHANG WEI-BIN [US], et al); | [X]JPH09183383 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH09269831 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]JPH10160486 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]US2011264320 (ARNAUD DANIEL [FR], et al); | [A]JP2012137823 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) |