EP3508764 - SPOOL VALVE, AND VALVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nabtesco Corporation 7-9, Hirakawacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASAKI Hitoshi c/o Seishin Plant NABTESCO CORPORATION 1617-1 Fukuyoshidai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2413 / JP | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17846519.1 | 29.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017JP31031 | Priority number, date | JP20160169776 | 31.08.2016 Original published format: JP 2016169776 | [2019/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018043514 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508764 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/26, F16K11/07, F16K31/06 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F16K31/0613 (EP);
F16K3/26 (KR);
F16K11/07 (KR);
F16K11/0716 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | F16K3/26, F16K11/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | SPULENVENTIL UND VENTILSYSTEM | [2019/28] | English: | SPOOL VALVE, AND VALVE SYSTEM | [2019/28] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR À TIROIR CYLINDRIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTEUR | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2019 | Translation filed | 28.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5996464 (MCLEVIGE DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP2642506 (FEI CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]CN104329487 (BAO WENBO) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]CN104500478B (LIN DONGLIANG) [A] 1-7* abstract * | International search | [A]CN104329487 (BAO WENBO) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]CN104500478 (LIN DONGLIANG) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0454111 |