EP3501479 - TABLET PRINTING DEVICE AND TABLET PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shibaura Mechatronics Corporation 5-1, Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGIMOTO, Shinichi c/o SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORPORATION 5-1 Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | 02 /
IKUTA, Ryo c/o SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORPORATION 5-1 Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | 03 /
OKABE, Yutaka c/o SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORPORATION 5-1 Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | 04 /
AOYAGI, Hitoshi c/o SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORPORATION 5-1 Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | 05 /
HOSHINO, Hikaru c/o SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORPORATION 5-1 Kasama 2-chome Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247-8610 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17846632.2 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017JP31314 | Priority number, date | JP20160170620 | 01.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016170620 | [2019/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018043628 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501479 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/06, B41J2/01, B41J3/60, B41J3/407, B41M5/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B41J3/4073 (EP,KR,US);
A61J3/10 (KR,US);
A61J3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/007 (KR,US);
B41J11/0085 (KR,US);
B41J11/0095 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A61J3/06, B41J2/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | TABLETTENDRUCKVORRICHTUNG UND TABLETTENDRUCKVERFAHREN | [2019/26] | English: | TABLET PRINTING DEVICE AND TABLET PRINTING METHOD | [2019/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION DE COMPRIMÉS ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION DE COMPRIMÉS | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | Translation filed | 18.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 18.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0150877 (MARS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP2875802 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JP2015204851 (KYOTO SEISAKUSHO) [X] 1-4,6,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [ 0025] , [ 0029] - [0043]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5 [I] 7; | [XAI]JP2016141515 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] - [ 0027] - [0046] - [ 0051] , [ 0055] - [0084]; figure 1 * [A] 6,7 [I] 5 | International search | [A]JP2007031007 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-9* , paragraphs [0024] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012051331 (RISO KAGAKU CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0020], [0027] to [0069]; fig. 1 to 14 & US 2012/0056925 A1 paragraphs [0047] to [0088]; fig. 1 to 14 *; | [A]JP2013013711 (KYOTO SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0039] to [0141]; fig. 1 to 37 & US 2014/0168309 A1 paragraphs [0084] to [0188]; fig. 1 to 37 & WO 2012/169391 A2 *; | [Y]JP2016141515 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0127]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH06143539 |