12.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.12.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2023 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
14.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
24.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
20.03.2020 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
22.11.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
06.09.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
26.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
27.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|