Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10920341 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2021 | B2 | US2018202074 | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP32478 | 08.09.2017 | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102070396B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2020 | B1 | KR20180067505 | 20.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP32478 | 08.09.2017 | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108323174B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2021 | B | CN108323174 | 24.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP32478 | 08.09.2017 | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3550059 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | A4 | EP3550059 | 09.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP32478 | 08.09.2017 | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018088014 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6612715B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | B2 | JP2018080403 | 24.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016221299 | 14.11.2016 |