EP3511218 - VEHICULAR TURNING CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yuta c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17848660.1 | 31.08.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017JP31487 | Priority number, date | JP20160174287 | 07.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016174287 | [2019/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018047720 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511218 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511218 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/02, B60K17/356, B60T8/1755, B60L15/20, B60K1/02, B60K7/00, B60W40/06, B60W40/068, B60W30/045 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B60W30/02 (EP,US);
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60W10/119 (US);
B60W10/184 (US);
B60W40/06 (EP);
B60W40/068 (EP);
B60K7/0007 (EP);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2520/16 (US);
B60W2520/26 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2540/12 (EP);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2552/40 (EP);
B60W2720/16 (US);
B60W2720/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | B60W30/02, B60K17/356, B60T8/1755, B60L15/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON FAHRZEUGWENDEMANÖVERN | [2019/29] | English: | VEHICULAR TURNING CONTROL SYSTEM | [2019/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE VIRAGE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2019 | Translation filed | 25.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2017 | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | IT | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | MT | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | GB | 31.08.2022 | IE | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | LU | 31.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 31.08.2017 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 31.08.2017 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 31.08.2017 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
GB | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0970876 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4* paragraph [0042]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2015209128 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2016035665 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] - [0077] *; | [A]US2016075237 (ZHANG YINGJIE [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0013] - [0023]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2016111779 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0016]; figure 3 *; | [AP]US2017166203 (SUGAI TOMOHIRO [JP]) [AP] 1-4 * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] - [0077]; figure 3 * | International search | [Y]JPH0971231 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0012], [0017] to [0018]; fig. 5 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH11240434 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 4* , paragraph [0022]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000025599 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 4 * , paragraph [0042]; fig. 3 & US 6223116 B1 page 5, left column, line 46 to right column, line 15; fig. 3 & EP 970876 A2 & DE 69931105 D *; | [Y]JP2008087680 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 4 * , paragraph [0041]; fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015209128 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0009], [0015], [0017] to [0018], [0025] to [0027], [0033]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * | Examination | EP0970876 |