Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021268466 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762469755 | 10.03.2017 | US202117320832 | 14.05.2021 | US201815913649 | 06.03.2018 | WO2017US49819 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020255299 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716330701 | 01.09.2017 | US201662383719 | 06.09.2016 | WO2017US49819 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11007500 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2021 | B2 | US2018257054 | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762469755 | 10.03.2017 | US201815913649 | 06.03.2018 | WO2017US49819 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109996596B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2022 | B | CN109996596 | 09.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662383719 | 06.09.2016 | WO2017US49819 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3509727 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3509727 | 22.04.2020 | A4 | EP3509727 | 17.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662383719 | 06.09.2016 | WO2017US49819 | 01.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018048735 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662383719 | 06.09.2016 |