EP3510642 - REEL-TO-REEL EXFOLIATION AND PROCESSING OF SECOND GENERATION SUPERCONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brookhaven Technology Group, Inc. Advanced Energy Center 1000 Innovation Road Stony Brook, NY 11794 / US | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLOVYOV, Vyacheslav 48 North Suffolk Drive Rocky Point, NY 11778 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17849501.6 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US50398 | Priority number, date | US201662384364P | 07.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384364 P | US201662427239P | 29.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662427239 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018048979 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510642 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H10N60/01 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H10N60/0801 (EP,KR,US);
B23K1/0008 (US);
C23C14/18 (US);
C23C14/5806 (US);
H01B12/06 (KR);
H01F6/06 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | H01L39/24, B05C9/14, B05D3/06, H01B3/30, H01B12/02, H01B12/06, H01F6/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Title | German: | ROLLE-ZU-ROLLE-EXFOLIATION UND VERARBEITUNG VON SUPRALEITERN DER ZWEITEN GENERATION | [2019/29] | English: | REEL-TO-REEL EXFOLIATION AND PROCESSING OF SECOND GENERATION SUPERCONDUCTORS | [2019/29] | French: | EXFOLIATION DE BOBINE À BOBINE ET TRAITEMENT DE SUPRACONDUCTEURS DE SECONDE GÉNÉRATION | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 16.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012105145 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP2955726 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]US5149681 (OHKAWA TIHIRO [US], et al); | [Y]US2005009981 (CHEN JIANN-HSING [US], et al); | [Y]US2008020304 (SCHRODER KURT A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008236743 (KYE MYEONG-HA [KR], et al); | [Y]US2009087234 (ROOF BRYAN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2009233800 (HUANG YIBING [US], et al); | [Y]US2012211475 (OSWALD JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [Y]US2014155269 (DAIBO MASANORI [JP]); | [Y]US2015251227 (KOELMEL VOLKER [DE]); | [Y]US2018027555 (KIM JUNHYEONG [KR], et al); |