EP3509599 - 1,2-DITHIOLANE COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN NEUROPROTECTION, AUTOIMMUNE AND CANCER DISEASES AND CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sabila Biosciences LLC 5 Overlook Road New City, NY 10956 / US | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSOUR, Tarek, S. 5 Overlook Road New City NY 10956 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Collen, E. 5 Overlook Road New City NY 10956 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17849588.3 | 08.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US50634 | Priority number, date | US201662384813P | 08.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384813 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018049127 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509599 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K31/4162, C07D339/04, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07D487/04 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D339/04 (US);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07C43/29 (US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | A61K31/519, A61K31/4162, C07D339/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Validation states | MA | 13.03.2019 | Title | German: | 1,2-DITHIOLAN-VERBINDUNGEN FÜR DIE NEUROPROTEKTION, AUTOIMMUN- UND KREBSERKRANKUNGEN UND -LEIDEN | [2019/29] | English: | 1,2-DITHIOLANE COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN NEUROPROTECTION, AUTOIMMUNE AND CANCER DISEASES AND CONDITIONS | [2019/29] | French: | COMPOSÉS 1,2-DITHIOLANE UTILES DANS LA NEUROPROTECTION, LES MALADIES ET LES ÉTATS AUTO-IMMUNS ET CANCÉREUX | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008121742 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-100; compounds 11, 13-15 * | International search | [A]US2010184760 (REN PINGDA [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * para [0035], [0396], [0689]; pg 127, compound 5 *; | [A]WO2011141909 (RADIKAL THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * pg 2, para 3-4; pg 3, para 4 to pg 5, para 1; pg 20, Table 2, compound 2; pg 32, para 4 to pg 33, para 1; pg 34-35, Schemes 1, 2 and 3 *; | [A]US8795706 (GARNER WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * col 18-22, Table 2; Table 3; Table 4; Table 5; col 24, In 24-45; col 31, In 20 to col 34, In 20 *; | [A]US2015018336 (CHEN WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * para [0005]; pg 108, Example 79; Example 80; pg 109, Example 82; pg 112, Example 85h; para [0416]-[0417] *; | [A]US2015284478 (AGAR JEFFREY N [US], et al) [A] 1-23* Entire Document *; | [A] - HOMHUAL et al., "Bruguiesulfurol, A new Sulfur Compound from Bruguiera gymnorrhiza", Planta Med., (20060000), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 255 - 260, XP018019704 [A] 1-23 * . abstract; pg 256, col 1, para 1; pg 259, col 1, para 2-3; Table 2 * |