EP3510752 - DOOR ACCESS CONTROL VIA A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRASAD, Vinay HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
ROY, Sanjay HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
TARANATH, Manu HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
TIGGA, Mandar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
SENAPATI, Haraprasad HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 06 /
JONES, Bryan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 07 /
GOPALAN, Murugan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 08 /
VALDER, Roshan Lawrence HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17849634.5 | 08.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US50729 | Priority number, date | US201662385020P | 08.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662385020 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018049193 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3510752 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G07C9/00, G07C9/22, G06F21/35 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C9/22 (EP,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Title | German: | TÜRZUGANGSKONTROLLE ÜBER EINE MOBILE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/29] | English: | DOOR ACCESS CONTROL VIA A MOBILE DEVICE | [2019/29] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS À UNE PORTE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8467770 (BEN AYED MOURAD [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 59 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, lines 24-41 * * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 24 * * column 11, lines 6-28 * * column 11, lines 48-55 * * column 13, line 39 - column 14, line 55 *; | [XI]EP2816532 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 1A-1D,2 * [I] 2,5,7,8,11-15; | [XI]US2015227923 (KUTSCH MICHAEL V [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0138] * [I] 2,5,7,8,11-15; | [A]US2016063230 (ALTEN BRETT [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0035] * | International search | [Y]JP4578984B (FUJITSU TEN LTD.) [Y] 1-10 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]KR101296863B (CONTROLS INC I [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraph [0040] and claim 2. *; | [A]KR101570601B (BONG-KWAN CHO) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1, 2. *; | [A]JP2015215663 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0015]-[0019]. *; | [A]KR101595897B (UNIV SOONGSIL RES CONSORTIUM [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0044] and figure 3. * |