EP3550627 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yuxin No. 9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Hongfei No. 9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WU, Xinyin No. 9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
QIAO, Yong No. 9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17849859.8 | 14.09.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017CN101720 | Priority number, date | CN201621310187U | 01.12.2016 Original published format: CN 201621310187 U | [2019/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099158 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550627 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K59/8731 (EP,KR);
H10K59/00 (US);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/41] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2018 | Translation filed | 22.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 12.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007134830 (PARK KYONG-TAE [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3* figure 5 *; | [XYI]US2008036388 (JUNG KWANG-CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 10-11 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 3-11; | [XYI]US2008160871 (OTA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 18-19 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 4-11; | [XYI]US2009115942 (WATANABE NORIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 2,3,12-14 [I] 4-11; | [XYI]US2010208188 (TSAI YUAN-CHIH [TW], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,12-14 [I] 4-11; | [XYI]US2011169810 (KIMURA HAJIME [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 2-11; | [XYI]US2013056735 (HEO SEONG-KWEON [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,3,12-14 [I] 4-11; | [Y]CN105304686 (SHANGHAI TIANMA ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY TEC, et al) [Y] 12-14 * figures 3-4 *; | [XYI]US2016218312 (CHANG SEIN [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,12-14 [I] 4-11; | [YP]US2017154938 (SU CONGYI [CN], et al) [YP] 12-14 * paragraph [0053]; figures 3-4 * |