EP3514516 - SENSOR, INPUT DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUHARA, Tomoko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
EBISUI, Akira c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURA, Taizo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
KOBAYASHI, Ken c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
GOTO, Tetsuro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
SAKAKURA, Yoshiaki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
TSUKAMOTO, Kei c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
HASEGAWA, Hayato c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 09 /
MIYAWAKI, Manami c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17850996.4 | 14.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017JP33355 | Priority number, date | JP20160179992 | 14.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016179992 | [2019/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018052096 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514516 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514516 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14, G01L5/00, G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G01L5/00 (EP,US);
G01L1/14 (EP);
G06F3/041 (EP);
G06F3/0443 (EP);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F3/0447 (EP,US);
G06F9/4418 (US);
G06F2203/04105 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | SENSOR, EINGABEVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/30] | English: | SENSOR, INPUT DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2019/30] | French: | CAPTEUR, DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2019 | Translation filed | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2023 | 21.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010079395 (KIM KYUNG JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2011037624 (PANCE ALEKSANDAR [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 5a * * paragraph [0061] * [I] 8,11,12; | [XI]WO2013048498 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * figures 3A, B * [I] 4,5,9-13 | International search | [A]JP3778148B (Tetsuo HOSODA) [A] 1-20* , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014147943 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , fig. 53 to 56 & US 2016/0026297 A1 & CN 105190492 A *; | [A]JP5686941B (Apple Inc.) [A] 1-20 * , fig. 11 & CN 104238808 A & EP 1853991 B1 & KR 10-1070111 B1 & US 7800592 B2 & WO 2006/096501 A1 *; | [A]JP5714935B (Kyocera Corp.) [A] 1-20 * , fig. 4 & US 2012/0218206 A1 *; | [A]JP2015232753 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-20 * , fig. 1 & JP 6050282 B2 & EP 2955603 A1 & US 9772661 B2 & KR 10-2015-0141150 A & CN 105183073 A *; | [A]JP2015232752 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-20 * , fig. 1 & JP 6092157 B2 & EP 2955615 A1 & US 9645711 B2 & KR 10-2015-0141148 A & CN 105183305 A * | Examination | EP1840715 | US2013234734 |