EP3512813 - CONTAINERIZED DESALINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluence Water Israel Ltd 1 Ha'eshel st Caesarea Industrial Park P.O. Box 3171 Caesarea / IL | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMARAL, Avraham Israel 1 Ha'eshel st Caesarea Industrial Park P.O. Box 3171 Caesarea / IL | 02 /
LEVY, Ravid 1 Ha'eshel street Caesarea Industrial Park P.O. Box 3171 Caesarea / IL | 03 /
ELOVIC, Phil 1 Ha'eshel street Caesarea Industrial Park P.O. Box 3171 Caeserea / IL | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17851630.8 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017US51842 | Priority number, date | US201662395317P | 15.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662395317 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018053304 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512813 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, B01D65/02, C02F103/08, B01D61/58, // B01D61/08, B01D61/18, B01D61/02, C02F3/20 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C02F1/444 (EP,IL,US);
B01D29/52 (IL,US);
B01D29/66 (IL,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,IL,US);
B01D61/08 (EP,IL,US);
B01D61/145 (IL,US);
B01D61/16 (IL,US);
B01D61/18 (EP,IL,US);
B01D61/58 (EP,IL,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,IL,US);
C02F1/004 (IL,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2201/202 (IL,US);
B01D2311/2649 (IL,US);
B01D2313/2011 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2313/246 (IL,US);
B01D2313/54 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2317/025 (IL,US);
B01D2317/04 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2317/06 (IL,US);
B01D2321/04 (IL,US);
B01D2321/12 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2321/14 (IL,US);
B01D2321/167 (EP,IL,US);
B01D2321/20 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,IL,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP);
C02F2209/008 (EP);
C02F2209/04 (EP);
C02F2209/06 (EP);
C02F2209/40 (EP);
C02F2303/16 (EP,IL,US);
C02F3/208 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | C02F1/44, B01D65/02, C02F103/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | CONTAINERISIERTES ENTSALZUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/30] | English: | CONTAINERIZED DESALINATION SYSTEM | [2019/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DESSALEMENT CONTENEURISÉ | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007181496 (ZUBACK JOSEPH E [US]); | [I]US2011049048 (BENNER WILLIAM [US], et al); | [I]WO2012037274 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [I]EP2727644 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [A]US5501798 (AL-SAMADI RIAD A [CA], et al); | [A]US2008173583 (BOODOO FRANCIS [US], et al); | [XA]WO2013033841 (TRILOGY ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al); | [A]US2014274857 (SCHACHT PAUL [US], et al); | [A]CN105152399 (CENTRAL RES INST BUILDING & CO, et al) | by applicant | WO2012037274 |