02.12.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
05.11.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.03.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2021 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
22.11.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
28.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
21.06.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
21.06.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
27.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
05.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|