EP3517395 - RAIL TRANSIT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Lin No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
ZENG, Hao No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Junjie No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
PENG, Fanghong No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
HUANG, Xingcan No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 17852078.9 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017CN75167 | Priority number, date | CN201610839745 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610839745 | CN201610840581 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610840581 | CN201610841071 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610841071 | [2019/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018053999 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517395 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/00, B61F5/00, B61F13/00, B61B13/04, B61D19/02 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B61B13/04 (EP);
B61D19/023 (US);
B61C9/50 (US);
B61F5/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENVERKEHRSSYSTEM | [2019/31] | English: | RAIL TRANSIT SYSTEM | [2019/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT FERROVIAIRE | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2019 | Translation filed | 23.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 03.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]CN106494414 (BYD CO LTD) [E] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0089-0151, and figures 1-32 *; | [E]CN106494415 (BYD CO LTD) [E] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0082-0151, and figures 1-32 *; | [E]CN106494431 (BYD CO LTD) [E] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0089-0151, and figures 1-32 *; | [Y]CN105035098 (S M T ITALIA S R L) [Y] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0054-0080, and figures 1-5 *; | [Y]CN204871031U (CHANGCHUN HENGFENG BUS EQUIPMENT COMPANY) [Y] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0026-0045, and figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2009266268 (TIMAN PETER EDWARD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs 0022-0048, and figures 2-9 *; | [Y]CN104554290 (TAIYUAN RAILWAY TRANSP EQUIP) [Y] 13-15 * , claims 1-2, and figures 1-3 and 11 *; | [Y]JP2016049840 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 13-15 * , description, paragraphs 0011-0027, and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN102358293 (UNIV CHONGQING JIAOTONG) [Y] 13-15 * , description, paragraphs 0012-0016, and figures 1-3 * |