EP3448949 - PAINT FILM APPLIQUES WITH REDUCED DEFECTS, ARTICLES, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Advanced Surface Technologies, LLC 1245 Kinnear Road Columbus, OH 43212 / US | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Entrotech, Inc. 1245 Kinnear Road Columbus, OH 43212 / US | ||
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Mcguire, Jr., James 8 Hillcrest Road Tiburon, California 94920 / US | ||
For all designated states Strange, Andrew, C. 6470 Evening Street Worthington, OH 43085 / US | |||
For all designated states Canan, Matthew 2999 Castlebrook Avenue Hilliard, Ohio 43206 / US | |||
For all designated states AERO Advanced Paint Technology, Inc. 1245 Kinnear Road Columbus, OH 43212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGUIRE, JR., James 8 Hillcrest Road Tiburon, California 94920 / US | 02 /
STRANGE, Andrew 6470 Evening Street Worthington, OH 43085 / US | 03 /
CANAN, Matthew 2999 Castlebrook Avenue Hilliard, Ohio 43206 / US | [2024/02] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
MCGUIRE, JR., James 8 Hillcrest Road Tiborn, California 94920 / US | ||
02 /
STRANGE, Andrew 6470 Evening Street Worthington, OH 43085 / US | |||
03 /
CANAN, Matthew 2999 Castlebrook Avenue Hilliard, Ohio 43206 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 17853688.4 | 14.09.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US51464 | Priority number, date | US201662396825P | 20.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662396825 P | WO2017US21982 | 11.03.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/021982 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018057378 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448949 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3448949 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3448949 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/40, C09J7/20, B32B7/06, B32B7/10, B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/20, B32B27/24, B32B27/36, C09J7/29 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B32B27/40 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B29C48/17 (US);
B29C48/21 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/24 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B37/12 (KR);
B32B37/153 (KR);
B32B7/06 (EP);
B32B7/10 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR);
C09J5/00 (US);
C09J7/25 (US);
C09J7/38 (US);
C09J7/385 (US);
C09J7/40 (US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
B29K2995/002 (US);
B29L2007/008 (US);
B29L2009/00 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2307/402 (KR,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP);
B32B2307/41 (EP);
B32B2307/416 (EP);
B32B2307/51 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/56 (EP);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2405/00 (US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,KR);
B32B2571/02 (EP);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08K5/0041 (EP);
C09J2203/306 (EP);
C09J2301/41 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | C09J7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACKSCHICHTAPPLIZIERUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTEN DEFEKTEN, ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN | [2019/10] | English: | PAINT FILM APPLIQUES WITH REDUCED DEFECTS, ARTICLES, AND METHODS | [2019/10] | French: | APPLIQUES DE FILM DE PEINTURE AYANT DES DÉFAUTS RÉDUITS, ARTICLES ET PROCÉDÉS | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214243.0 / EP4328280 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2818488 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) | International search | [XY]WO2006118883 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | [Y]US2008286576 (MCGUIRE JR JAMES E [US]); | [Y]US2010059167 (MCGUIRE JR JAMES E [US]); | [Y]US2011241261 (MCGUIRE JR JAMES E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016076337 (KURARAY CO [JP]); | [PX]WO2017156507 (ENTROTECH INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011 | US137006 | US4476293 | US5034275 | US5114789 | US5242751 | US5268215 | US5468532 | US5641374 | US5965256 | US5985079 | US6132864 | US6475616 | WO2006118883 | US7141303 | US2007047099 | US2008286576 | US2010059167 | US2011137006 | US2011241261 | US8828303 | EP2818488 | WO2016076337 | WO2017156507 | WO2017US21982 |