EP3515209 - EDIBLE CARAMEL COLOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Patents One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUCIK, Josef 3389 Bridle Run Train Marietta Georgia 30064 / US | 02 /
HONG, Sangphyo 90 Yantecaw Avenue Glen Ridge New Jersey 07028 / US | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17853789.0 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017US52444 | Priority number, date | US201662396994P | 20.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662396994 P | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018057587 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515209 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3515209 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23L5/42, A23L2/58, A23L5/40, A23G3/32, A23L5/48 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A23L5/48 (EP);
A23L5/42 (KR);
A23G3/32 (EP,US);
A23G3/343 (US);
A23G3/362 (US);
A23G3/42 (US);
A23L2/58 (EP,KR,US);
A23L5/40 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | A23L5/42, A23L2/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESSBARE KARAMELLFÄRBUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/31] | English: | EDIBLE CARAMEL COLOR COMPOSITION | [2019/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COULEUR CARAMEL COMESTIBLE | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2767108 (FETZER WALTER R); | [A]US3618588 (ANWAR MOHAMMAD H, et al); | [A]US2016128352 (JIANG HONGXIN [US], et al); | [A]CN105925011 (QIANHE CONDIMENT AND FOOD CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2767108 (FETZER WALTER R); | [A]US3618588 (ANWAR MOHAMMAD H, et al); | [A]US2016128352 (JIANG HONGXIN [US], et al); | [A]US2016236981 (BÜRGE CHRISTIAN [CH], et al); | [A]CN105925011 (QIANHE CONDIMENT AND FOOD CO LTD) | Examination | WO03038014 | US2004016482 | US2016236981 | by applicant | US2767108 | US3618588 | US2016128352 | CN105925011 |