EP3520683 - OCT PROBE USED FOR HUMAN OPEN TUBE CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Winstar Medical Technology Company Limited B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Zhigang B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, GuangzhouDevelopment District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 02 /
KONG, Guanyue B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Jun B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 04 /
MA, Hongjian B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Ziyi B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 06 /
LI, Jiaoyang B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 07 /
LI, Bailing B205, Area B Guangzhou International Business Incubator No.3 Juquan Road Science City, Guangzhou Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 17854371.6 | 16.03.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017CN76894 | Priority number, date | CN201610862276 | 27.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610862276 | [2019/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018058911 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520683 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/0066 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0073 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (CN,US);
A61B5/0086 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2562/0233 (US);
A61B2562/168 (EP);
G02B27/0018 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | OCT-SONDE FÜR EINEN MENSCHLICHEN OFFENEN SCHLAUCHHOHLRAUM | [2019/32] | English: | OCT PROBE USED FOR HUMAN OPEN TUBE CAVITY | [2019/32] | French: | SONDE OCT UTILISÉE POUR LA CAVITÉ DE TUBE OUVERT HUMAIN | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | Translation filed | 25.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008183343 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028]; figures 2,3 *; | [I]EP2153770 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0062] - [0072]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2011189078 (JAPAN HEALTH SCIENCE FOUND) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0048] - [0049]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2012172698 (TEO TAT-JIN [US], et al) [A] 8* paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 3 *; | [A]US8953911 (XU CHENYANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 11A * * column 17, lines 4-16; figure 16 *; | [I]US2016070070 (BHAGAVATULA VENKATA ADISESHAIAH [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figure 1 * | International search | CN103492857 [y] (HOYA CORP) [y] 1-8; | US2014340756 [y] (SINCLAIR MATTHEW A [US], et al) [y] 1-8; | US2015331191 [a] (HASEGAWA TAKEMI [JP], et al) [a] 1-8; | US2016120408 [a] (BHAGAVATULA VENKATA ADISESHAIAH [US], et al)[a] 1-8; | CN105722445 [a] (NAMIKI PRECISION JEWEL CO LTD) [a] 1-8; | CN106175700 [px] (GUANGDONG WINSTAR MEDICAL TECH COMPANY LTD) [px] 1-8 |