Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10705791 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2019227767 | 25.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710210512 | 31.03.2017 | CN201610857243 | 27.09.2016 | WO2017CN90387 | 27.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108476256 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710210512 | 31.03.2017 | CN201610857243 | 27.09.2016 | WO2017CN90387 | 27.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3512185 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | B1 | EP3512185 | 14.08.2019 | A4 | EP3512185 | 17.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710210512 | 31.03.2017 | CN201610857243 | 27.09.2016 | WO2017CN90387 | 27.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018059030 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710210512 | 31.03.2017 | CN201610857243 | 27.09.2016 |