EP3522040 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILE STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Zhiyong No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Qiqian No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Wei No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Li No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17854689.1 | 13.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017CN101642 | Priority number, date | CN201610856834 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610856834 | [2019/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018059239 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522040 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522040 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14, G06F16/11, G06F3/06 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/113 (EP,CN);
G06F11/1435 (EP,US);
G06F11/1446 (EP);
G06F11/1469 (CN,US);
G06F16/10 (US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G06F16/10 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DATEISPEICHERUNG | [2019/32] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILE STORAGE | [2019/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MÉMORISATION DE FICHIER | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | Translation filed | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2017 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | IE | 13.09.2022 | LU | 13.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 13.09.2017 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.09.2017 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.09.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 13.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN104408091 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 45] , [0 46] , [0 53] , [0 61] , [0 68] , [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 74] , [0 75] , [0 77] - [0081] *; | [A]US2006129614 (KIM HONG Y [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 40] - [0042] - [0 47] , [0 66] , [0 80] , [0 90]; figure 5 *; | [A] - JAN STENDER ET AL, "BabuDB: Fast and Efficient File System Metadata Storage", STORAGE NETWORK ARCHITECTURE AND PARALLEL I/OS (SNAPI), 2010 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100503), ISBN 978-1-4244-6810-2, pages 51 - 58, XP031752981 [A] 1-15 * page 2, column right, paragraphs "On-Disk Index" * * page 3, column left, paragraph "B. Checkpoints" * * page 3, column right, paragraph "A. Metadata Mappings" * * page 4, column right, paragraph "D. File System Snapshots" * | Examination | US2012117031 | - LAI CHUNBO ET AL, "Atlas: Baidu's key-value storage system for cloud data", 2015 31ST SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES (MSST), IEEE, (20150530), doi:10.1109/MSST.2015.7208288, pages 1 - 14, XP033196409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSST.2015.7208288 |