EP3512136 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianqin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17854793.1 | 25.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017CN103107 | Priority number, date | CN201610858515 | 28.09.2016 Original published format: CN201610858515 | [2019/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018059343 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512136 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3512136 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04B7/06 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (EP,CN,US);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04B17/24 (US);
H04B7/0645 (US);
H04B7/0658 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L1/0027 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/29] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES SIGNALS | [2019/29] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL | [2019/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2019 | Translation filed | 08.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2017 | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | ES | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | IT | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | MT | 02.03.2022 | NL | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | PT | 04.07.2022 | IE | 25.09.2022 | LU | 25.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 25.09.2017 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 25.09.2017 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.09.2017 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 25.09.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 25.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008253336 (PARKVALL STEFAN [SE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,13-15 * paragraph [0042] *; | [XY]US2010035644 (WU XIAOXIN [CN], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 18] , [0 22] * [Y] 2,3,8,9,11,12; | [A]US2016094287 (KIM KIJUN [KR], et al) [A] 2,3,8,9,11,12* paragraph [0105] *; | [Y]US2016149620 (KO HYUN SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3,8,9,11,12 * paragraph [0108] * |