EP3522354 - POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM AND POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMATSU, Yusuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
FUJII, Naoaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17855382.2 | 20.07.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017JP26342 | Priority number, date | JP20160193291 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016193291 | [2019/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018061424 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522354 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522354 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02M3/155, G05F1/67 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
G05F1/67 (EP,US);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02M7/44 (US);
H02M7/53871 (EP,US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,US);
H02M1/0003 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND LEISTUNGSUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/32] | English: | POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM AND POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2019/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2019 | Translation filed | 27.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | IT | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8184460 (O'BRIEN KATHLEEN ANN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 51; figure 2 * [I] 9,10; | [Y]JP2013090364 (GS YUASA CORP) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2014211530 (CHEN JIH-SHENG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-12* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JP2008015899 (EBARA DENSAN LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013225191 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015139277 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015154517 (SANSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016110524 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [EA]JP2017175826 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [EA] 1-12* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |