EP3522221 - IMAGING ELEMENT AND FOCUS ADJUSTMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Shutaro c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
TAKAGI, Toru c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 03 /
NAKAYAMA, Satoshi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 04 /
SEO, Takashi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 05 /
ANDO, Ryoji c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17855895.3 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017JP33939 | Priority number, date | JP20160194625 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016194625 | [2019/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018061940 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522221 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, G02B7/34, G03B13/36, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/369 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G02B7/34 (EP,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,US);
G03B13/36 (EP,US);
H01L27/14 (US);
H01L27/146 (US);
H01L27/14623 (US);
H01L27/14629 (EP,US);
H01L27/1464 (US);
H01L27/14685 (EP);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/55 (US);
H04N23/60 (US);
H04N23/672 (US);
H04N25/70 (EP,US);
H04N25/704 (US);
H01L27/14621 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSELEMENT UND FOKUSANPASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/32] | English: | IMAGING ELEMENT AND FOCUS ADJUSTMENT DEVICE | [2019/32] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE LA MISE AU POINT | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | Translation filed | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 19.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP2009109965 [y] (NIKON CORP) [y] 1-13; | JP2015076475 [y] (SONY CORP)[y] 1-13; | WO2016063727 [y] (SONY CORP [JP]) [y] 1-3 | by applicant | JP2010177704 | JP2016194625 |