EP3521259 - GLASS PANEL UNIT, GLASS WINDOW, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GLASS PANEL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Hiroyuki C/O PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
URIU, Eiichi C/O PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuya C/O PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NONAKA, Masataka C/O PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
ISHIBASHI, Tasuku C/O PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17856090.0 | 26.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017JP34669 | Priority number, date | JP20160194690 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016194690 | [2019/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062140 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3521259 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/06, E06B3/66 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
C03C27/10 (EP,US);
E06B3/6612 (EP,US);
E06B3/66304 (EP,US);
E06B3/6775 (EP);
C03C27/06 (US);
E06B3/663 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBENEINHEIT, GLASFENSTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GLASSCHEIBENEINHEIT | [2019/32] | English: | GLASS PANEL UNIT, GLASS WINDOW, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GLASS PANEL UNIT | [2019/32] | French: | UNITÉ DE PANNEAU DE VERRE, FENÊTRE EN VERRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNITÉ DE PANNEAU DE VERRE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2019 | Translation filed | 28.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014212605 (SON BEOM GOO [KR], et al) | International search | [YA]JPH09329783 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 1, 3, 5-7, 9 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0019], fig. 2 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4, 8, 10; | [Y]JP2003321255 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 5* , paragraphs [0001], [0023]-[0045], [0059] - [0060], fig. 1-7 & US 2005/0138892 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0032]-[0055], [0067]-[0068], fig. 1-7 & WO 2003/104158 A1 & EP 1506945 A1 & CN 1649803 A & KR 10-2005-0007380 A & AU 2003235848 A *; | [YA]JP2008266059 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3, 5-7, 9 * , paragraphs [0001], [0021]-[0036], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4, 8, 10; | [Y]WO2016147604 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-6 * , paragraphs [0001], [0056]-[0070], fig. 10-14 (Family: none) * |