EP3520796 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING WATER-SOLUBILIZED URSODEOXYCHOLIC ACID FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING INFLAMMATORY SKIN DISEASE OR SERIOUS PRURITUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoo's Biopharm Inc. Gasan-dong Daeryung Techno Town 8 Cha Suite 1514 96 Gamasan-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08501 / KR | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Yeong Ho 203-602 (Sindorim-dong Woosung 2-cha Apt.) 105 Sindorim-ro Guro-gu Seoul 08201 / KR | 02 /
KO, Hwi Jin 201, Seon Gyeong Heights Ville 35-21 Gurojungang-ro 28-gil Guro-gu Seoul 08294 / KR | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17856808.5 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017KR10893 | Priority number, date | KR20160126872 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160126872 | KR20170125571 | 27.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170125571 | [2019/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062922 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520796 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61K8/63, A61K9/06, A61K9/14, A61K9/70, A61Q19/00, A61K9/08 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,KR,US);
A01N65/08 (EP);
A01P3/00 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/146 (EP);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K9/7007 (EP,US);
A61P17/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | A61K31/575, A61K8/63, A61K9/06, A61K9/14, A61K9/70, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT IN WATER AUFGELÖSTER URSODEOXYCHOLSÄURE ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN HAUTKRANKHEITEN ODER SCHWEREM PRURITUS | [2019/32] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING WATER-SOLUBILIZED URSODEOXYCHOLIC ACID FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING INFLAMMATORY SKIN DISEASE OR SERIOUS PRURITUS | [2019/32] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE URSODÉSOXYCHOLIQUE SOLUBILISÉ DANS L'EAU AFIN DE PRÉVENIR OU DE TRAITER UNE MALADIE CUTANÉE INFLAMMATOIRE OU UN PRURIT GRAVE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2018 | Translation filed | 24.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 10.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0156547 (YOO SEO HONG [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005158408 (YOO SEO H [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0112]; examples 9,13,; claims 5,8 *; | [Y]WO2006026555 (YOO SEO HONG [US]) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US7052716 (LANZENDOERFER GHITA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]KR20030003952 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract; claims 1-3, *; | [Y]KR20010074748 (YOO. Seo Hong) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract; claims 1-6, 9-19 and 29-30; page 7, paragraphs [1]-[3]. *; | [Y]EP0720854 (MEDICHEMIE AG [CH]) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract; claims 1-3. *; | [Y]KR20070098821 (YOO SEO HONG [US]) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract; claims 1-9: paragraphs [32], [38], [47] and [135]-[158] *; | [Y]US2016175324 (DAYAN NAVA [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract; claims 36, 42 and 46-54. * |