EP3472519 - COOKING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE COOKING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Jae Sung 36 Wangsimni-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04773 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Yong Jong 275 Seongnam-daero Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13559 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Boo Keun 17 Dongbaek 1-ro 38beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17012 / KR | 04 /
SUNG, Han Jun 18 Baumoe-ro 35-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06744 / KR | 05 /
HA, Joo-Young 28-18 Dongsuwon-ro 537beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16503 / KR | 06 /
HAN, Jeong Su 53 Yeongtong-ro 514beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16712 / KR | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Rose, Kathryn Clare Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/13] |
Former [2019/17] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17856824.2 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017KR10943 | Priority number, date | KR20160127121 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160127121 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018062938 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472519 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3472519 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/02, F24C7/06, F24C7/08, H05B6/64, A47J36/16, A47J27/00, H05B6/66, H05B6/80 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A47J27/002 (EP,US);
H05B6/6402 (EP,KR,US);
A47J36/00 (US);
A47J36/16 (EP,US);
F24C7/06 (EP,US);
F24C7/085 (EP,US);
H05B1/0261 (KR);
H05B6/6411 (EP,KR,US);
H05B6/6441 (EP,US);
H05B6/645 (EP,US);
H05B6/6455 (KR);
H05B6/6482 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | F24C7/02, F24C7/06, F24C7/08, H05B6/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER KOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2019/17] | English: | COOKING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE COOKING APPARATUS | [2019/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE L'APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 23.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2017 | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | IT | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | MT | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | GB | 29.09.2022 | IE | 29.09.2022 | LU | 29.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.09.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4137442 (TATEDA KOICHI) [X] 1,2,5,6,13,14 * column 3, lines 3-7; figures 1-4,8 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US4357513 (KAWATA YUKIO, et al) [Y] 7 * column 6, lines 57-67; figures 1-6 *; | [X]JPS59138822 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1,2,5,8,13,14 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0966180 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,13,14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0021]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1058483 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, lines 1-12 ** page 5, lines 4-12 *; | [XA]US2004104219 (KIM KWANG-KEUN [KR]) [X] 1-5,8,13-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0049] , [0050] , [0051] , [0055] , [0059] , [0060] , [0065]; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 9-12 | International search | [A]US2009032521 (KIM TAE WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0053]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20090044749 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs <20>-<28>; and figure 2. *; | [Y]WO2011016405 (SENGOKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]US2013336131 (ZHANG XIAOXIN [US], et al) [Y] 2-4, 9-12, 14-15 * See paragraphs [0011], [0013], [0048], [0052], [0082]; and figures 1, 7. *; | [XY]US2014318386 (KIM HAN JU [KR]) [X] 1, 5-6, 8, 13 * See paragraphs [0010], [0084], [0108], [0246], [0270]; and figure 2. * [Y] 2-4, 7, 9-12, 14-15 | Examination | US2014318386 | by applicant | US4137442 | JPS59138822 | US2004104219 |