EP3519049 - SAFE AND EFFECTIVE METHOD OF TREATING PSORIASIS WITH ANTI-IL23 SPECIFIC ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDAZZO, Bruce 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 02 /
WASFI, Yasmine 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17857471.1 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US54217 | Priority number, date | US201662402403P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662402403 P | US201762532068P | 13.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762532068 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018064436 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519049 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61P25/00, A61P37/00 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | A61P25/00, A61P37/00, C07K16/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | 30.04.2019 | ME | 30.04.2019 | Validation states | MA | 30.04.2019 | MD | 30.04.2019 | Title | German: | SICHERES UND EFFIZIENTES VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSORIASIS MIT ANTI-IL23-SPEZIFISCHEM ANTIKÖRPER | [2019/32] | English: | SAFE AND EFFECTIVE METHOD OF TREATING PSORIASIS WITH ANTI-IL23 SPECIFIC ANTIBODY | [2019/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ SÛR ET EFFICACE DE TRAITEMENT DU PSORIASIS AVEC UN ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUE CONTRE L'IL-23 | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 25.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018093841 (JANSSEN BIOTECH INC [US]); | International search | [Y]US2009181027 (DAL MONTE PAUL [US], et al); | [XY]US2011287028 (BENSON JACQUELINE [US], et al); | [Y]US2015147337 (REICHERT PAUL [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016031250 (KIRIN AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2016222102 (ARNDT MATTHIAS [DE], et al) | by applicant | EP0003089 | US4309989 | US4399216 | US4589330 | WO8605803 | US4634665 | US4656134 | US4676980 | EP0229046 | EP0229246 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4704692 | US4766067 | US4767402 | WO8806630 | US4795699 | US4800159 | US4816567 | US4818542 | WO8906283 | US4873316 | US4889818 | WO9003809 | WO9004036 | US4921794 | EP0368684 | EP0371998 | US4939666 | US4946778 | US4956288 | US4965188 | WO9014443 | WO9014424 | WO9014430 | WO9100360 | US4994370 | WO9105939 | WO9109630 | WO9117271 | US5066584 | WO9118980 | WO9119818 | WO9200373 | US5091310 | WO9205258 | US5122464 | US5130238 | US5142033 | WO9214843 | US5149636 | WO9216221 | WO9218619 | US5168062 | US5179017 | WO9308278 | WO9308829 | US5223409 | US5225539 | EP0550400 | US5260203 | US5266491 | WO9401234 | EP0590689 | US5304489 | GB2272440 | WO9425585 | US5385839 | US5403484 | WO9516027 | US5427908 | US5455030 | US5496549 | WO9607754 | EP0710719 | WO9613583 | EP0438474 | US5518889 | EP0463151 | WO9618978 | US5530101 | WO9619256 | US5534621 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5565362 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | US5571698 | US5576195 | US5580717 | US5580734 | US5582996 | US5585089 | US5595898 | US5601819 | WO9708320 | US5618920 | WO9713852 | US5625126 | US5625825 | US5627052 | US5633425 | US5641670 | US5643759 | US5643768 | US5656730 | US5658754 | US5661016 | US5693762 | US5693493 | US5698435 | US5698417 | EP0814259 | US5714352 | US5723323 | US5733746 | US5733761 | US5750373 | US5763192 | US5763733 | WO9824893 | WO9824884 | US5766886 | US5767260 | US5770428 | US5770359 | US5789650 | US5807706 | US5814476 | US5817483 | US5821333 | US5824514 | US5827690 | US5827739 | US5833985 | WO9850433 | US5837500 | US5839446 | WO9853847 | US5849992 | US5851198 | US5856456 | US5885793 | WO9916419 | US5932448 | US5959084 | US5959083 | WO9954342 | US5976862 | US5989530 | US5994616 | US6010902 | US6019968 | US6037453 | US6060285 | WO0042072 | US6106833 | US6132992 | US6180370 | US6193967 | US6204023 | US6210668 | US2003003097 | WO03011878 | US7935344 | GB19890001334 | GB19910001134 | WO1991US02989 | WO1991GB01134 | WO1991US07149 | GB19920001755 | GB19920002240 | WO1992GB00883 | WO1992GB01755 | WO1993GB00605 | WO1994US01234 | WO1994GB01422 | US19940350260 | WO1994GB02662 | WO1997GB01835 | WO1998US16280 |