EP3521678 - RESIN PIPE FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. 7-1 Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Makoto c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Masaki c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 03 /
FUJII, Tatsuya c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 04 /
IIDA, Toshihide c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 05 /
KOIKE, Tomoyuki c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | 06 /
MAKIHATA, Shintaro c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | [2020/07] |
Former [2019/32] | 01 /
FUJII, Makoto c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAMOTO, Masaki c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJII, Tatsuya c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
IIDA, Toshihide c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
05 /
KOIKE, Tomoyuki c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | |||
06 /
MAKIHATA, Shintaro c/o NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD. 7-1, Shinmachi 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Steinerstraße 15/A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/32] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17858018.9 | 15.06.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017JP22142 | Priority number, date | JP20160195426 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016195426 | JP20160195427 | 03.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016195427 | [2019/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018066178 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3521678 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3521678 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/04 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
F16L47/041 (EP,US);
F16L47/04 (KR);
F16L19/028 (KR,US);
F16L19/043 (US);
F16L19/061 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | F16L47/04, F16L19/028 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZROHRVERSCHRAUBUNG | [2019/32] | English: | RESIN PIPE FITTING | [2019/32] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAU EN RÉSINE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2019 | Translation filed | 03.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 26.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | IT | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | GB | 15.06.2023 | IE | 15.06.2023 | LU | 15.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
GB | 15.06.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
IE | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5388871 (SAITOH MASAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-4 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 32 * * column 4, line 7 - column 9, line 14; figure - *; | [I]EP1041330 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figure - *; | [I]EP2995838 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0103]; figure - *; | [I]EP3001086 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0109]; figure - * | International search | [A]JPS499784Y (Tokyo Shibaura Electric Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-4 * , column 2, lines 11 to 34; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS60175983U (Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-4* , specification, page 3, line 12 to page 4, line 20; drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS61179481U (Kurabo Industries Ltd.) [A] 1-4 * , specification, page 9, line 18 to page 16, line 17; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016052223 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0049], [0062]; fig. 1 & US 2017/0159854 A1 paragraphs [0056] to [0076], [0089]; fig. 1 & JP 2016-70388 A & KR 10-2017-0002576 A & CN 106461130 A & TW 201627463 A * |