EP3525472 - RECEPTION DEVICE, TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGISHI, Yasuaki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17858194.8 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017JP33798 | Priority number, date | JP20160196107 | 04.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016196107 | [2019/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018066355 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525472 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/434, H04H60/73, H04H20/42 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
H04H20/423 (EP,US);
H04N21/2385 (KR);
H04H20/86 (US);
H04H20/02 (US);
H04H20/33 (KR);
H04H60/73 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (KR);
H04N21/2393 (KR);
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/33] | English: | RECEPTION DEVICE, TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2019 | Translation filed | 06.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2023 | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/07] | 09.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016112157 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,10,13-15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0078]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0091] * * pages 22,25; table 1 * * figure 10 * * paragraph [0097]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0101] - [0102]; figure 11 * * paragraphs [0107] - [0108] * * paragraph [0110] *[I] 3-7,9,11,12 | International search | [A]JP2004312413 (SONY CORP) [A] 2-12* , paragraphs [0060]-[0061], fig. 1 & US 2006/0212531 A1, paragraphs [0114]-[0115], fig. 1 & WO 2004/090736 A1 & EP 1612686 A1 & CN 1788259 A *; | [X]JP2013524620 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [X] 1-20 * , paragraphs [0028]-[0068], [0081]-[0089], [0095]-[0102], [0382]-[0387], fig. 1-2, 34-35 & US 2013/0081087 A1, paragraphs [0047]-[0087], [0100]-[0108], [0114]-[0121], [0400]-[0405], fig. 1-2, 34-35 & WO 2011/122914 A2 & EP 2544447 A2 & CN 102918857 A * |