12.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.02.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2022 |
First examination report |
|
17.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
13.03.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.12.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
06.12.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
12.07.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
12.07.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
14.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
08.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|