EP3523665 - TEST FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teradyne, Inc. 600 Riverpark Drive North Reading, MA 01864 / US | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTO, Anthony J. 154 Kendall Hill Road Sterling, Massachusetts 01564 / US | 02 /
WRINN, Joseph Francis 5 Hollywood Road Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | 03 /
TOSCANO, John P. 22 Hilltop Farm Road Auburn, Massachusetts 01501 / US | 04 /
ARENA, John Joseph 26 Francis Drive Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17858872.9 | 08.09.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US50695 | Priority number, date | US201615285090 | 04.10.2016 Original published format: US201615285090 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018067267 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3523665 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R1/073, G01R3/00, // H05K3/12, H05K3/40, H05K3/46 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G01R31/2808 (EP,US);
G01R1/0416 (US);
G01R1/07378 (EP,US);
G01R3/00 (EP,US);
G01R31/2806 (US);
H05K1/0268 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | G01R31/317, G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | TESTVORRICHTUNG | [2019/33] | English: | TEST FIXTURE | [2019/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE TEST | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1906189 (FORMFACTOR INC [US]) [X] 1,4,8,10,14 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *[I] 7; | [X]US2014253159 (DEMILLE DONALD [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10,11,14 * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *; | [XYI]US2015137848 (LEWINNEK DAVID WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9-11,15 * figures 3-5,7,8,10 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] * [Y] 6,9,15 [I] 3-5,7,8,12-14; | [XYI]DE102015206000 (FEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10-14 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 6,9,15 [I] 3,5 | International search | [A]US6047469 (LUNA L JACK [US]) [A] 1-24* See column 4, line 65-column 5, line 64 and figures 1,2. *; | [YA]US2004196025 (CASEY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15, 18-24 * See paragraph [24] and figure 3. * [A] 16-17; | [Y]US2008157806 (LEE SOO HO [KR]) [Y] 2, 14 * See paragraphs [38]-[44] and figures 6-8. *; | [A]US2011234249 (UEMATSU YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [23]-[32] and figures 1,2. *; | [Y]US2015137848 (LEWINNEK DAVID WALTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-15, 18-24 * See paragraph [56] and figures 3,4. * | by applicant | US2015 | EP1906189 | US2014253159 | DE102015206000 |