EP3520116 - DUPLEX ACCIDENT TOLERANT COATING FOR NUCLEAR FUEL RODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | For all designated states Wisconsin Alumni Research Foundation 614 Walnut Street Madison, WI 53726 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHODA, Edward J. 116 Washington Street Edgewood, PA 15218 / US | 02 /
XU, Peng 1805 Lake Carolina Drive Columbia, SC 29229 / US | 03 /
OELRICH, Robert 410 Turkey Pointe Circle Columbia, SC 29223 / US | 04 /
SRIDHARAN, Kumar 333 W. Mifflin Street Unit 5080 Madison, WI 53703-6003 / US | 05 /
MAIER, Benjamin 5923 State Road 113 Waunakee, WI 53597 / US | 06 /
JOHNSON, Greg 4613 Steinhauer Trail Madison, WI 53716 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/32] | 01 /
LAHODA, Edward J. 116 Washington Street Edgewood, Pennsylvania 15218 / US | ||
02 /
XU, Peng 1805 Lake Carolina Drive Columbia, South Carolina 29229 / US | |||
03 /
OELRICH, Robert 410 Turkey Pointe Circle Columbia, South Carolina 29223 / US | |||
04 /
SRIDHARAN, Kumar 333 W. Mifflin Street Unit 5080 Madison, Wisconsin 53703-6003 / US | |||
05 /
MAIER, Benjamin 5923 State Road 113 Waunakee, Wisconsin 53597 / US | |||
06 /
JOHNSON, Greg 4613 Steinhauer Trail Madison, WI 53716 / US | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17858946.1 | 02.10.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US54697 | Priority number, date | US201662403304P | 03.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662403304 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018067425 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3520116 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3520116 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/20, G21C21/02, B05B7/14, B32B15/01, C22C16/00, G21C3/07, C23C14/16, C23C24/08, C23C28/02, C22C27/06 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G21C3/07 (EP,US);
G21C3/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/01 (EP);
C22C16/00 (EP);
C22C27/06 (EP);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (US);
C23C24/08 (EP,US);
C23C24/087 (EP,US);
C23C28/021 (EP,US);
C23C28/023 (EP,US);
G21C21/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | G21C3/20, G21C21/02, B05B7/14, B32B15/01, C22C16/00, G21C3/07, C23C14/16, C23C24/08, C23C28/02 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | G21C3/20, G21C3/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNFALLTOLERANTE DUPLEX-BESCHICHTUNG FÜR KERNREAKTORBRENNSTÄBE | [2019/32] | English: | DUPLEX ACCIDENT TOLERANT COATING FOR NUCLEAR FUEL RODS | [2019/32] | French: | REVÊTEMENT TOLÉRANT AUX ACCIDENTS EN DUPLEX POUR BARRES DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLÉAIRE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 03.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2017 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | IE | 02.10.2021 | LU | 02.10.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 02.10.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.10.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 02.10.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.10.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5302414 (ALKHIMOV ANATOLY P [SU], et al) [A] 1-15* column 12, lines 27-49; figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [Y]US2014254740 (LEDFORD KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 2-6,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0 35] - [0040]; figure 2 *; | [XY]WO2016042262 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,13-15 * page 8, lines 15-24 * * page 20, lines 1-6 * * page 21, lines 1-26 * [Y] 2-6,10,12,14,15 | International search | [A]JP2006219740 (CHOKOON ZAIRYO KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs 16-23, and figure 1. *; | [A]US2014241485 (DI FONZO FABIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs 16-25, and claim 1. *; | [Y]US2014254740 (LEDFORD KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 3-7, 10-16, 23, 25 * See paragraphs 31-40, and figure 3. *; | [A]US2015050521 (LE FLEM MARION [FR], et al) [A] 1-29* See paragraphs 117-123, and figures 1-4. *; | [XY]WO2016042262 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-2, 8-9, 17-22, 24 ,26-29 * See abstract, page 8, lines 25-35, page 31, lines 24-31, and claims 3, 8, 13-16. * [Y] 3-7, 10-16, 23, 25 |