28.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.09.2022 |
First examination report |
|
29.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
13.12.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
13.12.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
12.07.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
30.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|