Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11015540 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2021 | B2 | US2020049084 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US54909 | 03.10.2017 | US201662405542 | 07.10.2016 | US201716339634 | 03.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109790770 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US54909 | 03.10.2017 | US201662405542 | 07.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3523521 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | A4 | EP3523521 | 14.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US54909 | 03.10.2017 | US201662405542 | 07.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018067543 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662405542 | 07.10.2016 |