EP3522824 - BALLOON CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/33] | BALLOON CATHETER SYSTEMS | ||
[2023/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Corporation 2-44-1 Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Ayu 280 Tustin Field Drive Tustin, California 92782 / US | 02 /
TAKAI, Hironori 6221 Residencia Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2023/35] |
Former [2019/33] | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 17859220.0 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017US55422 | Priority number, date | US201662404647P | 05.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662404647 P | US201662414520P | 28.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662414520 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018067875 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522824 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522824 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/95, A61F2/962, A61F2/966 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M25/0021 (US);
A61M25/10185 (US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0098 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLONKATHETER | [2023/11] | English: | BALLOON CATHETER | [2023/11] | French: | CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2023/11] |
Former [2019/33] | BALLONKATHETERSYSTEME | ||
Former [2019/33] | BALLOON CATHETER SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2019/33] | SYSTÈMES DE CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP23192287.3 / EP4282385 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | LU | 05.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 05.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 05.10.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5342307 (EUTENEUER CHARLES L [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 9 *; | [A]US5800517 (ANDERSON CURTIS E [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5893868 (HANSON SCOTT M [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 11 *; | [A]US6110146 (BERTHIAUME WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004093005 (DURCAN JONATHAN P [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 3, 5 *; | [Y]US2010249490 (FARNAN ROBERT C [US]) [Y] 11-13 * paragraph [0034]; figures 3A-4D *; | [A]US2011208284 (HOFMANN ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2012296313 (ANDREACCHI ANTHONY S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 2, 3 *; | [A]US2014221831 (KURRUS MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5876374 (ALBA PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2007219612 (ANDREAS BERNARD [US], et al) [Y] 2, 9 * entire document *; | [A]US2009227949 (KNAPP DAVID [US], et al) [A] 3, 11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015352340 (EWING BENJAMIN T [US], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 4-10, 12-14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016074632 (MOEHL RAIMUND [CH], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 4-10, 12-14 * entire document *; | [A]US9445929 (LONGO MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14* entire document * | by applicant | US5342307 | US5893868 |