EP3523333 - ANTI-CEACAM6 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Singapore Health Services Pte Ltd 31 Third Hospital Avenue 03-03 Bowyer Block C Singapore 168753 / SG | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis North Tower Singapore 138632 / SG | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUNG, Hau Wan c/o Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way Level 4 (Stem Cells) Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | 02 /
CHOO, Andre Boon Hwa c/o Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way Level 4 (Stem Cells) Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | 03 /
DING, Mei Yee Vanessa c/o Bioprocessing Technology Institute 20 Biopolis Way 06-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | 04 /
TAN, Shao Weng Daniel c/o National Cancer Centre Singapore 11 Hospital Drive Singapore 169610 / SG | 05 /
IYER, Narayanan Gopalakrishna c/o National Cancer Centre Singapore 11 Hospital Drive Singapore 169610 / SG | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/33] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17859752.2 | 10.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017SG50509 | Priority number, date | SG20161008481W | 10.10.2016 Original published format: SG10201608481W | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018070936 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3523333 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3523333 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K39/395, G01N33/574, A61P35/00, A61K47/68 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6415 (KR,US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6857 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/1048 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (US);
C07K16/3023 (EP);
C07K16/40 (KR);
C07K16/44 (US);
G01N33/57473 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/33] | C07K16/30, A61K39/395, G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-CEACAM6-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2019/33] | English: | ANTI-CEACAM6 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE | [2019/33] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CEACAM6 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016150899 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) | International search | [X]WO2011163401 (NEOGENIX ONCOLOGY INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO0029004 |