EP3441685 - AIR CHILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Thermal Systems, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAOKA Masahiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
OKADA Takuya c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
GOTO Takahide c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17860146.4 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP36811 | Priority number, date | JP20160202648 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016202648 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018070422 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441685 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/16, F24F1/10, F24F1/24, F24F1/26, F24F5/00, F25B1/00, F24F11/30, F24F1/30, F24F1/46, F24F13/30 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
F24F1/10 (EP,KR);
F24F1/16 (EP,KR);
F24F1/24 (KR);
F24F1/26 (EP,KR);
F24F1/30 (EP);
F24F1/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | F24F1/16, F24F1/10, F24F1/24, F24F1/26, F24F5/00, F25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | LUFTKÜHLER | [2019/07] | English: | AIR CHILLER | [2019/07] | French: | REFROIDISSEUR D'AIR | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | Translation filed | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 12.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/22] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2014206330 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [I] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [Y]JP2010266126 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0011] - [0035]; figures 6-8 *; | [Y]WO2011099629 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0055] - [0063]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]CN201539921U (GUANGDONG KELON AIR CONDITIONER CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015000114 (TRANE INT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0032] - [0063]; figures 1-6b * | International search | [Y]JP2010266126 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0011], [0032]-[0035], fig. 6-8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2011099629 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0036], [0055]-[0063], fig. 1-3, 8 & JP 2011/099629 A1 & CN 102753895 A & KR 10-2012-0116973 A & CN 105004027 A *; | [A]JP2010216798 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-4 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2011/0303396 A1, entire text, all drawings & WO 2010/095470 A1 & EP 2402665 A1 & TW 201042217 A & CN 102317701 A * |