EP3526626 - LASER SCANNER WITH REAL-TIME, ONLINE EGO-MOTION ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaarta, Inc. Suite 430 5001 Baum Boulevard Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15213 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ji Suite 430 5001 Baum Boulevard Pittsburgh PA 15213 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Sanjiv Suite 430 5001 Baum Boulevard Pittsburgh PA 15212 / US | 03 /
DOWLING, Kevin Joseph Suite 430 5001 Baum Boulevard Pittsburgh PA 15213 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Nevett, Duncan Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17860192.8 | 10.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US55938 | Priority number, date | US201662406910P | 11.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662406910 P | WO2017US21120 | 07.03.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/021120 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071416 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526626 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S17/66, G01S17/93, G01S7/48, G01S7/481, G01S7/51, G01S17/42, G01S17/86 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/66 (EP);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (EP);
G01S7/4813 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G01S17/89, G01S17/66, G01S17/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | LASERSCANNER MIT ONLINE-EIGENBEWEGUNGSSCHÄTZUNG IN ECHTZEIT | [2019/34] | English: | LASER SCANNER WITH REAL-TIME, ONLINE EGO-MOTION ESTIMATION | [2019/34] | French: | SCANNER LASER À ESTIMATION D'ÉGO-MOUVEMENT EN LIGNE EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE102014019671 (FARO TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0055] * [Y] 5,6,9,10; | [XYI] - THOMAS WIEMANN ET AL, "Automatic construction of polygonal maps from point cloud data", SAFETY SECURITY AND RESCUE ROBOTICS (SSRR), 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20100726), doi:10.1109/SSRR.2010.5981571, ISBN 978-1-4244-8898-8, pages 1 - 6, XP031928204 [X] 1-4 * paragraph [III.A]; figures 3-6 * * paragraph [00I.] * [Y] 5,6,9,10 [I] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SSRR.2010.5981571 | [XYI] - BENJAMIN ADLER ET AL, "Towards autonomous airborne mapping of urban environments", MULTISENSOR FUSION AND INTEGRATION FOR INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS (MFI), 2012 IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120913), doi:10.1109/MFI.2012.6343030, ISBN 978-1-4673-2510-3, pages 77 - 82, XP032470265 [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [III.D]; figure 3 * * abstract * * paragraph [00I.] * [Y] 6,9,10 [I] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MFI.2012.6343030 | [Y] - CHEN CHAO-I ET AL, "Drogue tracking using 3D flash lidar for autonomous aerial refueling", LASER RADAR TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS XVI, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110513), vol. 8037, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.886572, pages 1 - 11, XP060014758 [Y] 6 * paragraph [03.2]; figure 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.886572 | International search | [A]US2009262974 (LITHOPOULOS ERIK [CA]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]EP2133662 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013325244 (WANG YULUN [US], et al) [Y] 16-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2016189348 (CANTER PETER [CA]) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [Y]US2016234476 (MILLETT MARSHALL REED [US]) [Y] 2-4, 11-15, 23-26 * entire document *; | [XY]US2016274589 (TEMPLETON BRADLEY [US], et al) [X] 1, 8 * entire document * [Y] 2-7, 9, 10, 16-26; | [Y] - ZHENG et al., "Non-local Scan Consolidation for 3D Urban Scenes", ACM SIGGRAPH, (20100000), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://graphics.stanford.edu/-niloy/research/scan_consolidation/scan_consolidation_sig_10.html, (20180120), XP058312512 [Y] 5-7, 9-15 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1833349.1778831 | by applicant | DE102014019671 | - M. KAESSA. RANGANATHANF. DELLAERT, "iSAM: Incremental Smoothing and Mapping", IEEE Trans. on Robotics, TRO, (20081200), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1365 - 1378 | WO2017US21120 |