EP3526686 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC, STRUCTURED CONTENT MANAGEMENT AND DELIVERY PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-Agree, LLC 8577 Sudley Road Manassas, VA 20110 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERVIN, Thomas 8341 Tillett Loop Manassas VA 20110 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17860313.0 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US56186 | Priority number, date | US201662407091P | 12.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662407091 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071570 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526686 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/186, G06F40/197, G06F9/44, G06Q10/10, G06F16/176, G06F16/18 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G06F16/176 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (US);
G06F16/1873 (EP,US);
G06F16/93 (US);
G06F40/186 (EP,US);
G06F40/197 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q10/103 (EP,US);
G06Q10/107 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | G06F17/27, G06F9/44, G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR EINE PLATTFORM ZUR VERWALTUNG UND BEREITSTELLUNG ELEKTRONISCHER STRUKTURIERTER INHALTE | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRONIC, STRUCTURED CONTENT MANAGEMENT AND DELIVERY PLATFORM | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE PLATEFORME DE DISTRIBUTION ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU STRUCTURÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011276875 (MCCABE ANDREW DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2007198533 (FOYGEL DAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [XA]US2015127668 (TROTTIER DENISE [CA], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 10 * ; figures 2, 3; paragraphs [0029], [0031-0033]; claims 4, 7, 8 * [A] 11, 12, 16 & 20; | [A]US2014040863 (HALE JOSEPH BENJAMIN [GB], et al) [A] 1, 2, 6, 10, 11, 12, 16, 20 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2016151028 (BRITE:BILL LTD [IE]) [A] 1, 2, 6, 10, 11, 12, 16, 20 * ; entire document * |